HOUSE
EUGENE KUBINA
16th-20th Legislature (1989 -1998)
District: 35
Party: Democrat
1989-1990 Representative "Appointed January 8, 1990 to fill the vacancy created by the resignation of Representative Bette M. Cato"
1991-1992 Representative
1995-1998 Representative
Date/Place of Birth:
April 4, 1948
Warren, Ohio
Occupation:
Teacher
Spouse:
Dona
Children:
Kaelani (daughter)
Residency in Alaska:
Shismaret 19n-78
Valdez: 1978-present
Education:
High School: Pacific High, 1964-66
University: San Bernadino Valley College
San Diego State University, 1971-74, BA
University of Hawaii, 1981-&4, MA, School Administration
political and Government Positions:
State House - appointed in 1989, elected in 1990, 1994. Chaired
State Affairs Committee and served on the Governor's special
committees on the selmon industry and the Exxon Valdez. Now
serving as Minority Whip and on the gas line interim oommittee
Business and Professional Positions:
President/vice President,
Alaska Federation of Teachers; Board of Directors,
Copper Valley Electric Association; Valdez, Cordova, Copper Basin
and Delta Chambers of Commerce .
Service Organization Membership:
Veterans of Foreign Wars, Eagles, KCHU Public Radio, Horizons
Unlimited, N.RA, Elks, American Legion, Advocates for Victims of
Violence •
Special Interests:
Fishing, sailing, raising my daughter
Legislative Service:
Bill | Short Title | Prime Sponsor(s) | Current Status | Status Date | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
EXEMPT SCHOOLS FROM CERTAIN DEC FEES | REPRESENTATIVE KUBINA |
CHAPTER 90 SLA 95 | 06/28/1995 | ||
PERMITS FOR DRIVING SNOWMOBILES | REPRESENTATIVE KUBINA |
(H) TRA | 03/24/1995 | ||
FAVOR TRANS-ALASKA GAS SYSTEM & LNG SALES | REPRESENTATIVE KUBINA |
LEGIS RESOLVE 46 | 04/17/1996 |
Cosponsored Bills
Bill | Short Title | Prime Sponsor(s) | Current Status | Status Date | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
BOOT CAMP FOR NONVIOLENT OFFENDERS | REPRESENTATIVE WILLIS |
CHAPTER 110 SLA 96 | 06/27/1996 | ||
PAYMENT OF COSTS OF DWI ACCIDENTS | REPRESENTATIVE DAVIES |
CHAPTER 87 SLA 95 | 06/20/1995 | ||
CONVEY TIDE/SUBMERGED LAND TO MUNICIPALIT | REPRESENTATIVE MOSES |
CHAPTER 95 SLA 95 | 06/29/1995 | ||
DNA TESTING OF VIOLENT OFFENDERS | REPRESENTATIVE PARNELL |
CHAPTER 10 SLA 95 | 04/26/1995 | ||
AUTHORITY TO PRONOUNCE DEATH | REPRESENTATIVE THERRIAULT |
CHAPTER 53 SLA 95 | 05/27/1995 | ||
ASSISTIVE TECHNOLOGY LOAN GUARANTEES | REPRESENTATIVE PORTER |
CHAPTER 65 SLA 95 | 06/05/1995 | ||
LIMIT NAMES ON GENERAL ELECTION BALLOT | REPRESENTATIVE BARNES |
WITHDRAWN BY SPONSR | 02/10/1995 | ||
ASSAULT BY ADULTS ON CHILDREN | REPRESENTATIVE BUNDE |
CHAPTER 54 SLA 95 | 05/27/1995 | ||
CONVENING LEGISLATURE AFTER GOV ELECTION | REPRESENTATIVE B.DAVIS |
CHAPTER 72 SLA 96 | 06/19/1996 | ||
UNEMPL'T COMP FOR SOME SCHOOL EMPLOYEES | REPRESENTATIVE BRICE |
(H) HES | 01/23/1995 | ||
REPORTS BY OUT OF STATE FISHING VESSELS | REPRESENTATIVE WILLIAMS |
(H) RLS | 02/06/1995 | ||
TERM OF FISH BOARD MEMBERS | REPRESENTATIVE AUSTERMAN |
CHAPTER 8 SLA 96 | 03/29/1996 | ||
REPORTS TO THE LEGISLATURE | REPRESENTATIVE G.DAVIS |
CHAPTER 21 SLA 95 | 05/10/1995 | ||
DELEGATION OF DUTIES TO DENTAL ASSISTANTS | REPRESENTATIVE TOOHEY |
CHAPTER 83 SLA 95 | 06/16/1995 | ||
INDECENT PHOTOGRAPHY | REPRESENTATIVE MACKIE |
CHAPTER 29 SLA 95 | 05/15/1995 | ||
AHFC HOUSING LOANS | REPRESENTATIVE FOSTER |
(S) FIN | 04/27/1996 | ||
SEAFOOD PROCESSING STANDARDS | REPRESENTATIVE MOSES |
CHAPTER 48 SLA 95 | 05/26/1995 | ||
RIP FOR SCHOOL DISTRICT EMPLOYEES | REPRESENTATIVE MACKIE |
CHAPTER 65 SLA 96 | 06/18/1996 | ||
SHALLOW NATURAL GAS LEASING | REPRESENTATIVES OGAN, ROKEBERG |
CHAPTER 140 SLA 96 | 07/11/1996 | ||
MANDATORY INSURANCE FOR COSTS OF BIRTH | REPRESENTATIVE ROBINSON |
(H) HES | 01/30/1996 | ||
STATE EMPLOYEE INCENTIVE AWARD | REPRESENTATIVE ROBINSON |
(H) L&C | 01/31/1996 | ||
G.O. BONDS: SCHOOLS & UNIV. | REPRESENTATIVE MACKIE |
(H) HES | 02/12/1996 | ||
STUDENT CONTEST TO NAME NEW FERRY | REPRESENTATIVE WILLIAMS |
(S) CALENDAR 5/7 | 05/07/1996 | ||
EXPORT OF ALASKA OIL | REPRESENTATIVE FINKELSTEIN |
LEGIS RESOLVE 5 | 03/06/1995 | ||
SUIT RE POWS & MIAS AGAINST U.S. & OTHERS | REPRESENTATIVE JAMES |
LEGIS RESOLVE 31 | 09/19/1995 | ||
EXPORT OF ALASKA OIL | REPRESENTATIVE NAVARRE |
(H) O&G | 01/16/1995 | ||
ENDORSING ANWR LEASING | REPRESENTATIVE NAVARRE |
LEGIS RESOLVE 4 | 07/25/1995 | ||
SUPPORT 10TH AMENDMENT ENFORCEMENT ACT | REPRESENTATIVE BARNES |
LEGIS RESOLVE 70 | 05/29/1996 | ||
COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT FISHING QUOTAS | REPRESENTATIVE AUSTERMAN |
LEGIS RESOLVE 35 | 09/19/1995 | ||
POSTAGE STAMP HONORING ALASKA SALMON | REPRESENTATIVE ELTON |
LEGIS RESOLVE 29 | 09/19/1995 | ||
AK NAT'L GUARD YOUTH CORPS CHALLENGE PROG | REPRESENTATIVE BRICE |
HELD TO 5/7 CAL(S) | 05/06/1996 | ||
ALASKA GARDEN WEEK | REPRESENTATIVE ELTON |
HOUSE RESOLVE 10 | 08/07/1995 | ||
ANTITRUST EXEMPTION FOR FISHERMEN | SENATOR DUNCAN |
CHAPTER 45 SLA 95 | 05/26/1995 | ||
INS.FOR PROSTATE & CERVICAL CANCER TESTS | SENATOR DUNCAN |
CHAPTER 74 SLA 96 | 06/20/1996 | ||
TWENTY-SEVENTH ANNUAL GIRLS' STATE | SENATOR TORGERSON |
LEGIS RESOLVE 15 | 08/07/1995 | ||
TWENTY-NINTH ANNUAL BOYS' STATE | SENATOR TORGERSON |
LEGIS RESOLVE 14 | 08/07/1995 | ||
ANNIVERSARY OF END OF WORLD WAR II | SENATOR TAYLOR |
LEGIS RESOLVE 20 | 07/04/1995 | ||
OPPOSING FEDERAL MANDATES ON STATES | SENATOR TAYLOR |
LEGIS RESOLVE 3 | 04/07/1995 |