HOUSE
RICHARD FOSTER
16th-26th Legislature (1989 -2010)
House Majority Whip
District: 39
Party: Democrat
1989-2006 Representative
2007-2008 Representative Majority Whip
2009-2010 Representative Deceased; October 13, 2009
Date/Place of Birth:
August 9, 1946
Nome, Alaska
Residency in Alaska:
Nome: 1946 - present
Occupation:
Retired Air Taxi
Education:
Nome High School: Graduated 1964
University of Alaska, Fairbanks
- B.B.A.: 1964 - 1968
Military:
3 years service
U.S. Army, Captain
Vietnam Service Medal (2 tours)
Bronze Star Medal
Two Army Commendation Medals
Other Political and Government Positions:
Majority Whip: 1991 - present
Co-Chair, Finance Committee: 1995 - 1996
Chair, Transportation Committee: 1991 - 1994
Co-Chair, Special Committee on Military & Veterans' Affairs: 1993 - 1994
Finance Committee: 1993 - 1994, 1997 - present
Special Committee on Military & Veterans' Affairs: 1995 - 2000
Deferred Maintenance Task Force Committee: 1997 - 1998
Alcohol & Alcohol Abuse Task Force Committee: 1993 - 1994
Finance Subcommittees:
- Chair, Court System: 1999 - 2000
- Chair, Military & Veterans' Affairs: 1993 - 2006
- Chair, Transportation & Public Facilities:1993 - 1998, 2001 - 2006
- Co-Chair, Governor: 1995 - 1996
- Co-Chair, Legislature: 1995 - 1996
Bush Caucus: 1989 - present
Business and Professional Positions:
Former Chair, Sitnasuak Native Corporation
Former Board Member, Bering Straits Native Corporation
Member, Nome Eskimo Community (IRA Council)
Service Organizations and Community Involvement:
Former Board Member, Nome Community Center
Norton Sound Health Corporation
NW Community College
Rotary and Lions Clubs
Pioneer Igloo #1
Federal Selective Service Board
Nome Planning and Zoning Commission
Nome School Board
Nome City Council
Special Interests:
Enjoying the country, Music by Spank The Dog
Legislative Service:
- 26th (2009-2010)
- 25th (2007-2008)
- 24th (2005-2006)
- 23rd (2003-2004)
- 22nd (2001-2002)
- 21st (1999-2000)
- 20th (1997-1998)
- 19th (1995-1996)
- 18th (1993-1994)
- 17th (1991-1992)
- 16th (1989-1990)
Legislative Service:
- 26th (2009-2010)
- 25th (2007-2008)
- 24th (2005-2006)
- 23rd (2003-2004)
- 22nd (2001-2002)
- 21st (1999-2000)
- 20th (1997-1998)
- 19th (1995-1996)
- 18th (1993-1994)
- 17th (1991-1992)
- 16th (1989-1990)
Bill | Short Title | Prime Sponsor(s) | Current Status | Status Date | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
No Bills |
Cosponsored Bills
Bill | Short Title | Prime Sponsor(s) | Current Status | Status Date | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
VOCATIONAL EDUC ACCT/VOC-TECH EDUC | REPRESENTATIVE NEUMAN |
CHAPTER 47 SLA 08 | 05/28/2008 | ||
INFANTS WHO ARE SAFELY SURRENDERED | REPRESENTATIVES LEDOUX, GRUENBERG, LYNN, HARRIS, NEUMAN, WILSON, DAHLSTROM, GARDNER, OLSON, DOLL, KERTTULA |
CHAPTER 1 SLA 08 | 02/11/2008 | ||
EXTEND BOARD OF MIDWIVES | REPRESENTATIVES KAWASAKI, WILSON |
CHAPTER 12 SLA 07 | 05/11/2007 | ||
PUBLIC ACCESS TO FISHING STREAMS | REPRESENTATIVE GARA |
(H) FIN | 02/07/2007 | ||
TAX CREDIT FOR CONTRIBUTIONS TO VOC ED | REPRESENTATIVE NEUMAN |
CHAPTER 48 SLA 08 | 05/28/2008 | ||
MUNICIPAL PROPERTY TAX EXEMPTIONS | REPRESENTATIVES GRUENBERG, CHENAULT |
(S) FIN | 05/11/2007 | ||
DRIVERS LICENSE: ALCOHOL AWARENESS/MINOR | REPRESENTATIVE RAMRAS |
CHAPTER 118 SLA 08 | 07/23/2008 | ||
CITIZEN ADVISORY COMM ON FEDERAL AREAS | REPRESENTATIVE KELLY |
CHAPTER 40 SLA 07 | 07/03/2007 | ||
EXTENDING COUNCIL ON DOMESTIC VIOLENCE | REPRESENTATIVE FAIRCLOUGH |
CHAPTER 4 SLA 07 | 03/15/2007 | ||
DENTAL HYGIENISTS | REPRESENTATIVE STOLTZE |
(S) FIN | 05/04/2007 | ||
INDEMNITY CLAUSE IN PUBLIC CONTRACTS | REPRESENTATIVE JOHNSON BY REQUEST |
CHAPTER 4 SLA 08 | 02/26/2008 | ||
BIG GAME GUIDES AND TRANSPORTERS | REPRESENTATIVE LEDOUX |
CHAPTER 49 SLA 08 | 05/28/2008 | ||
PERM. FUND DIV.: CONTRIBUTION/EXECUTIONS | REPRESENTATIVE THOMAS |
CHAPTER 41 SLA 08 | 05/23/2008 | ||
EMINENT DOMAIN / FISHING WATERWAYS | REPRESENTATIVE JOHNSON |
(S) FIN | 05/09/2007 | ||
SENIOR BENEFITS/MED. ASSISTANCE ELIG. | REPRESENTATIVE HAWKER |
RETURNED TO (H) RLS | 04/10/2007 | ||
BAN COMPUTER-ASSISTED REMOTE HUNTING | REPRESENTATIVE BUCH |
CHAPTER 33 SLA 07 | 07/03/2007 | ||
HIGH ENERGY COST OFFSET FUND | REPRESENTATIVE NELSON |
(H) CRA | 03/26/2007 | ||
APPROP: LOW INCOME ENERGY ASSISTANCE | REPRESENTATIVE NELSON |
(H) FIN | 03/27/2007 | ||
KENAI GASIFICATION PROJECT; RAILROAD BOND | REPRESENTATIVE CHENAULT |
CHAPTER 65 SLA 07 | 08/25/2007 | ||
LEAVE FOR ORGAN/BONE MARROW DONATIONS | REPRESENTATIVE LEDOUX |
CHAPTER 80 SLA 08 | 06/06/2008 | ||
STATE OFFICERS COMPENSATION COMMISSION | REPRESENTATIVE DOOGAN |
(S) RLS | 03/31/2008 | ||
MUNI TAX EXEMPTION: COMBAT RELATED DEATH | REPRESENTATIVE COGHILL |
CHAPTER 89 SLA 08 | 06/13/2008 | ||
COMPASSIONATE GIFT EXEMPTION | REPRESENTATIVE COGHILL |
CHAPTER 2 SLA 08 | 02/13/2008 | ||
STATE'S CONTROL OF NATIONAL GUARD | REPRESENTATIVE ROSES |
LEGIS RESOLVE 6 | 05/28/2007 | ||
WW II FILIPINO VETS:BENEFITS/IMMIGRATION | REPRESENTATIVE LEDOUX |
(S) FIN | 05/14/2007 | ||
PEACE OFFICER CONVICTED OF MURDER | SENATOR OLSON |
CHAPTER 8 SLA 07 | 04/27/2007 |