HOUSE
CHARISSE MILLETT
26th-30th Legislature (2009 -2018)
House Majority Leader
District: 25
Party: Republican
2009-2014 Representative
2015-2018 Representative House Majority Leader
:
Date/Place of Birth:
February 11th, 1964 in Juneau, Alaska
Residency in Alaska:
Juneau: 1964-1966
Fairbanks: 1967-1969
Anchorage: 1970-Current
Occupation:
Airline Employee/Management: 1981-2005
Legislative/Administration Staff: 2005-2007
Commercial Fisher: 1992 Current
Family:
Children: Zachery, Ashley, Zane
Education:
A.J. Dimond High School: 1978-1981
University of Alaska, Anchorage: 1981-1983
Other Political and Government Positions:
Abbott Loop Community Council, Past Vice-president
ASD Minority Educations Concerns Advisory Committee, Past Member
Legislative Aide
Special Assistant, Legislative Liaison
Department of Administration, Special Assistant for Communications
District 30 Republicans, Past Chair
Business and Professional Positions:
The Alliance, Member
Resource Development Council, Member
National Rifle Association, Past Board Member
Arctic Winter Games, Past Board Member
Valdez, Kenai, Soldotna, and Homer Chamber of Commerce, Past Member
Service Organizations and Community Involvement:
American Red Cross Alaska, Board Member
Blood Bank of Alaska, Donor
Special Interests:
Hunting, Sport Fishing, Travel, Family, Running, Camping & Boating
Legislative Service:
Legislative Service:
Bill | Short Title | Prime Sponsor(s) | Current Status | Status Date | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARCH 27: GREAT ALASKA EARTHQUAKE DAY | REPRESENTATIVE MILLETT |
CHAPTER 2 SLA 15 | 04/18/2015 | ||
SEX ABUSE/ASSAULT/DATING VIOL PREV. PROGS | REPRESENTATIVE MILLETT |
CHAPTER 2 SSSLA 15 | 07/09/2015 | ||
ELIGIBILITY FOR AK ENERGY EFFIC LOANS | REPRESENTATIVES KREISS-TOMKINS, MILLETT |
(H) RLS | 04/10/2016 | ||
INS. FOR DEPENDS. OF DECEASED FIRE/POLICE | REPRESENTATIVE MILLETT |
WITHDRAWN | 04/13/2016 | ||
BOARD OF CHILD CUSTODY INVESTIG.; COURTS | REPRESENTATIVE MILLETT |
(H) L&C | 01/21/2015 | ||
GOV COUNCIL ON DISABILITIES/SPECIAL ED | REPRESENTATIVE MILLETT |
CHAPTER 5 SLA 16 | 05/04/2016 | ||
PEACE OFFICER/FIREFIGHTER RETIREMENT | REPRESENTATIVE MILLETT |
(H) L&C | 01/30/2015 | ||
RESTRICTIONS ON SALE OF DEXTROMETHORPHAN | REPRESENTATIVE MILLETT |
CHAPTER 16 SLA 16 | 06/02/2016 | ||
CRIMINAL LAW/PROCEDURE; DRIV LIC; PUB AID | REPRESENTATIVE MILLETT |
(H) JUD | 04/17/2015 | ||
NONRESIDENT SURCHARGE COMMERCIAL FISHING | REPRESENTATIVE MILLETT |
WITHDRAWN | 04/07/2016 | ||
PERM FUND: EARNINGS, DEPOSITS, ACCOUNTS | REPRESENTATIVE MILLETT |
(H) FIN | 02/08/2016 | ||
CHILD SAFETY SEAT INSTALLATION LIABILITY | REPRESENTATIVE MILLETT |
CHAPTER 31 SLA 16 | 07/01/2016 | ||
SUSTAINABLE BUDGET REPORTING | REPRESENTATIVE MILLETT |
(H) FIN | 02/12/2016 | ||
G.O. BONDS: PORT OF ANCHORAGE | REPRESENTATIVE MILLETT BY REQUEST |
(H) FIN | 02/22/2016 | ||
CONGENITAL DIAPHRAGM. HERNIA ACTION DAY | REPRESENTATIVE MILLETT |
LEGIS RESOLVE 15 | 04/18/2015 | ||
FEDERAL CONTAMINATION OF ANCSA LANDS | REPRESENTATIVE MILLETT |
LEGIS RESOLVE 9 | 09/01/2015 | ||
LIMIT DECLARATION OF NATL. MONUMENTS | REPRESENTATIVE MILLETT |
LEGIS RESOLVE 19 | 09/01/2015 |
Cosponsored Bills
Bill | Short Title | Prime Sponsor(s) | Current Status | Status Date | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
STATE ARCTIC POLICY | REPRESENTATIVE HERRON |
CHAPTER 10 SLA 15 | 05/11/2015 | ||
AUTOMATED EXTERNAL DEFIBRILLATOR | REPRESENTATIVE WILSON |
CHAPTER 19 SLA 15 | 05/14/2015 | ||
PRIV EMPLOYER VOLUNTARY VET PREFERENCE | REPRESENTATIVE TUCK |
(S) RLS | 04/17/2015 | ||
ELECT MONITORING CREDITS;MITIGATING FCTRS | REPRESENTATIVE WILSON |
CHAPTER 20 SLA 15 | 05/14/2015 | ||
DHSS DUTIES;CINA; FOSTER CARE; ADOPTION | REPRESENTATIVE GARA |
CHAPTER 7 4SSLA 16 | 07/26/2016 | ||
CONSTITUTIONAL HISTORY CURRICULUM | REPRESENTATIVES KELLER, SADDLER, LYNN |
(H) FIN | 02/27/2015 | ||
PUBL EMPL HEALTH INS; WELLNESS COMMITTEE | REPRESENTATIVE SEATON |
(H) FIN | 02/06/2015 | ||
JAN 9: AK LAW ENFORCEMENT OFFICERS' DAY | REPRESENTATIVES LYNN, TALERICO, VAZQUEZ, WOOL, CLAMAN |
CHAPTER 1 SLA 15 | 04/03/2015 | ||
WORKFORCE INVESTMENT BOARD VETERAN MEMBER | REPRESENTATIVE SADDLER |
CHAPTER 33 SLA 15 | 06/02/2015 | ||
ALASKA OIL AND GAS DAY | REPRESENTATIVE LYNN |
(H) STA | 01/21/2015 | ||
ALASKA FIREFIGHTERS' DAY | REPRESENTATIVES LYNN, CLAMAN |
CHAPTER 7 SLA 15 | 05/05/2015 | ||
MILITARY MERITORIOUS AWARD LICENSE PLATES | REPRESENTATIVES GARA, GRUENBERG, VAZQUEZ, LYNN, LEDOUX |
(S) STA | 04/09/2015 | ||
ELECTRONIC DISTRIB. OF REPORTS | REPRESENTATIVE KREISS-TOMKINS |
(S) STA | 04/13/2015 | ||
DONATED LEAVE BY CERTAIN PUBLIC EMPLOYEES | REPRESENTATIVE LYNN |
(H) STA | 01/23/2015 | ||
DISABILITY:ID/LICENSE AND TRAINING RQMTS. | REPRESENTATIVE THOMPSON |
(S) RLS | 04/14/2016 | ||
REPEAL COLLEGE/CAREER READINESS ASSESS. | REPRESENTATIVE GATTIS |
(S) EDC | 04/19/2015 | ||
EXEMPTION: LICENSING OF CONTRACTORS | REPRESENTATIVE TILTON |
WITHDRAWN | 04/16/2016 | ||
REPEAL COLLECTION OF CIVIL LITIG. INFO | REPRESENTATIVE LEDOUX |
(S) RLS | 04/16/2016 | ||
PROBATION & PAROLE: WORK, TRAVEL ACCOM. | REPRESENTATIVE TILTON |
CHAPTER 49 SLA 16 | 07/28/2016 | ||
BD OF REGENTS REGIONAL RESIDENCY QUALIF. | REPRESENTATIVE GATTIS |
VETOED BY GOVERNOR | 09/08/2016 | ||
PERS CREDIT/WORKERS COMP. POLICE & FIRE | REPRESENTATIVE JOSEPHSON |
(H) L&C | 02/18/2015 | ||
AK SOVEREIGNTY;US TRANSFER LAND TO ALASKA | REPRESENTATIVE CHENAULT |
(S) JUD | 02/05/2016 | ||
ALASKA WILD SALMON DAY | REPRESENTATIVE EDGMON |
CHAPTER 6 SLA 16 | 05/07/2016 | ||
AGDC SUPPORT OF NATURAL GAS PROJECTS | REPRESENTATIVE CHENAULT |
VETOED BY GOVERNOR | 04/17/2015 | ||
ESTABLISH ELDERS' DAY | REPRESENTATIVE FOSTER |
(S) RLS | 04/15/2015 | ||
FOOD PROGRAM DONATIONS; FISH AND GAME | REPRESENTATIVE KREISS-TOMKINS |
(H) RES | 04/08/2015 | ||
PERSON W/DISABILITY SAVINGS ACCOUNTS | REPRESENTATIVE SADDLER |
CHAPTER 56 SLA 16 | 08/06/2016 | ||
PARENT-GUARDIAN/CHILD:TEMP. POWER OF ATTY | REPRESENTATIVE KELLER |
(H) HSS | 04/16/2015 | ||
ENFORCEMENT OF FOREIGN PROTECTIVE ORDERS | REPRESENTATIVE EDGMON |
(H) RLS | 02/03/2016 | ||
INCREASE OF APPROPRIATION ITEM | REPRESENTATIVE HAWKER |
(S) RLS | 04/15/2016 | ||
INSURANCE COVERAGE FOR TELEMEDICINE | REPRESENTATIVE VAZQUEZ |
CHAPTER 17 SLA 16 | 06/13/2016 | ||
INDIGENOUS PEOPLES DAY;KATIE JOHN DAY | REPRESENTATIVE DRUMMOND |
(S) STA | 04/04/2016 | ||
AGDC BOARD OF DIRECTORS | REPRESENTATIVE CHENAULT |
(H) RES | 01/29/2016 | ||
ATTY GEN: SERVICE ON BOARDS/COMMISSIONS | REPRESENTATIVE CHENAULT |
(H) JUD | 02/01/2016 | ||
LAYOFF OF TENURED TEACHERS | REPRESENTATIVE TILTON |
(H) EDC | 02/05/2016 | ||
RECREATIONAL/AVOCATIONAL TRAINING EXEMPT. | REPRESENTATIVE GATTIS |
CHAPTER 21 SLA 16 | 06/17/2016 | ||
MOTOR VEHICLE DEALER FRANCHISES | REPRESENTATIVE PRUITT |
(H) L&C | 02/19/2016 | ||
YOUTH MARIJUANA PREVENTION GRANT FUND | REPRESENTATIVE LEDOUX |
(H) HSS | 02/22/2016 | ||
VIOLENT CRIMES COMP BOARD MEMBERSHIP | REPRESENTATIVE LEDOUX |
(S) RLS | 04/06/2016 | ||
REGULATION OF SMOKING | REPRESENTATIVE TALERICO |
(H) JUD | 04/01/2016 | ||
MEDICAL ASSISTANCE EOB FOR SERVICES | REPRESENTATIVE VAZQUEZ |
(H) HSS | 02/22/2016 | ||
MEDICAL ASSISTANCE PROVIDER FRAUD | REPRESENTATIVE VAZQUEZ |
(H) HSS | 02/22/2016 | ||
ADOPTION OF REGS; LIMITATIONS; VOID REGS | REPRESENTATIVE PRUITT |
(H) FIN | 03/18/2016 | ||
LIMIT ABORTION SERV. PROVIDERS IN SCHOOLS | REPRESENTATIVE GATTIS |
(H) EDC | 02/24/2016 | ||
JAN 24 - 30, 2016: AK SCHOOL CHOICE WEEK | REPRESENTATIVE GATTIS |
LEGIS RESOLVE 5 | 09/01/2015 | ||
US COUNTERMAND CONVENTION; DELEGATES | REPRESENTATIVE HUGHES |
LEGIS RESOLVE 46 | 09/23/2016 | ||
CHILD ABUSE PREVENTION MONTH | REPRESENTATIVE TARR |
(S) STA | 04/07/2015 | ||
CONST. AM: PERM. FUND PER. OF MRKT. VALUE | REPRESENTATIVE HAWKER |
(H) STA | 01/30/2015 | ||
OFFSHORE OIL & GAS REVENUE SHARING | REPRESENTATIVE SADDLER |
LEGIS RESOLVE 8 | 09/01/2015 | ||
RECOGNIZE ACADEMY OF MODEL AERONAUTICS | REPRESENTATIVE HUGHES |
LEGIS RESOLVE 13 | 09/01/2015 | ||
OPPOSE ALEUTIAN NATIONAL MARINE SANCTUARY | REPRESENTATIVE EDGMON |
LEGIS RESOLVE 6 | 09/01/2015 | ||
FEDS ALLOW STATE TO MAKE ENERGY CHOICES | REPRESENTATIVE TALERICO |
(H) RLS | 03/11/2015 | ||
ENDORSING ANWR LEASING; RELATED ISSUES | REPRESENTATIVE TALERICO |
LEGIS RESOLVE 2 | 09/01/2015 | ||
OPPOSE ANWR WILDERNESS DESIGNATION | REPRESENTATIVE NAGEAK |
LEGIS RESOLVE 1 | 09/01/2015 | ||
RETAIN ARMY FORCES IN ALASKA | REPRESENTATIVE REINBOLD |
LEGIS RESOLVE 4 | 09/01/2015 | ||
CALL FOR US COUNTERMAND CONVENTION | REPRESENTATIVE HUGHES |
LEGIS RESOLVE 49 | 09/15/2016 | ||
LIFT FEDERAL LAND WITHDRAWALS | REPRESENTATIVE KELLER |
LEGIS RESOLVE 20 | 09/01/2015 | ||
CONST. AM: ELECTED ATTORNEY GENERAL | REPRESENTATIVE JOHNSON |
(H) JUD | 04/19/2015 | ||
OPPOSING GM SALMON | REPRESENTATIVE TARR |
(S) RLS | 04/17/2016 | ||
POST-TRAUMATIC STRESS INJURY | REPRESENTATIVE HERRON |
LEGIS RESOLVE 50 | 09/15/2016 | ||
MAX F. GRUENBERG JR. COMMITTEE ROOM | REPRESENTATIVE CHENAULT |
HOUSE RESOLVE 6 | 08/26/2016 | ||
VOTER LIST ACCURACY; ELECTION PAMPHLETS | SENATOR MICCICHE |
CHAPTER 13 SLA 16 | 05/27/2016 | ||
OPIOID OD DRUGS: DISPENSING; IMMUNITY | SENATOR ELLIS |
CHAPTER 2 SLA 16 | 03/14/2016 | ||
IMMUNITY FOR FIRE DEPT. & MEMBERS | SENATOR COGHILL |
CHAPTER 15 SLA 15 | 05/11/2015 | ||
VACCINE CERTIFICATION FOR PHARMACISTS | SENATOR GIESSEL BY REQUEST |
CHAPTER 16 SLA 15 | 05/11/2015 | ||
LEGISLATIVE MEMBERS OF AGDC BOARD | SENATOR COSTELLO |
VETOED BY GOVERNOR | 07/20/2016 | ||
INSURER'S USE OF CREDIT HISTORY/SCORES | SENATOR HUGGINS |
VETOED BY GOVERNOR | 07/20/2016 | ||
PARENT-GUARDIAN/CHILD:TEMP. POWER OF ATTY | SENATOR GIESSEL |
CHAPTER 28 SLA 16 | 06/22/2016 | ||
CIVICS EDUCATION TASK FORCE | SENATOR STEVENS |
LEGIS RESOLVE 34 | 08/16/2016 | ||
SEXUAL ASSAULT AWARENESS MONTH:APRIL 2015 | SENATOR MEYER |
LEGIS RESOLVE 10 | 09/01/2015 | ||
SEXUAL ASSAULT AWARENESS MONTH:APRIL 2016 | SENATOR MEYER |
LEGIS RESOLVE 33 | 08/16/2016 |