SENATE
GARY WILKEN
20th-25th Legislature (1997 -2008)
District: O
Party: Republican
1997-2008 Senator
Date/Place of Birth:
January 24, 1946
Tacoma, Washington
Residency in Alaska:
Fairbanks: 1951 - 1970, 1975 - present
Spouse:
Wife - Susan
Children:
Children - Matthew, Allison, Karen, Bob
Grandchildren - Evan, Mason, Charlotte
Occupation:
Small Business Owner - retired
Education:
Lathrop High School:
Oregon State University:
- B.S. Business and Technology: 1964 - 1968
- M.B.A. in Business: 1970
Alaska State Senate:
1997 - present
Co-Chair, Armed Services Joint Committee:
2001 - present
Co-Chair, Finance Committee: 2003 - present
Chair, Long Term Care Task Force:
1999 - 2000
Co-Chair, Long Term Care Task Force:
1997 - 1998
Vice-Chair, Resources Committee: 2001 - 2002
Legislative Budget & Audit Joint Committee:
1999 - present
Health, Education & Social Services Committee:
1997 - present
Finance Committee: 1999 - present
Transportation Committee: 1997 - 1998, 2001 - 2002
Joint Armed Services Committee: 1999 - present
Military Bases Joint Committee: 1999 - 2000
State Affairs Committee: 1999 - 2000
Administration Regulation Review Committee:
1997 - 1998
Deferred Maintenance Review Committee:
1997 - 1998
Finance Subcommittees:
- Chair, Community & Economic Development:
2003 - present
- Chair, Transportation & Public Facilities:
2003 - present
- Chair, Education & Early Development:
1999 - present
- Chair, Court System: 1999 - 2002
- Chair, Law: 2001 - 2002
- Chair, Administration: 1999 - 2000
- Governor: 2003 - present
- Legislature: 2003 - present
- University of Alaska: 1997 - present
- Military and Veterans Affairs: 2001 - 2002
- Capital Budget: 1999 - 2002
- Education: 1997 - 1998
- Natural Resources: 1997 - 1998
- Revenue: 1997 - 1998
Fairbanks/Interior Delegation: 1997 - present
Other Political and Government Positions:
Fairbanks Public Utility Board: 1983 - 1995
US Air Force Civilian Advisory Board: 1994 - present
Business and Professional Positions:
Owner, Wilken-Alaska (Fairbanks Distributors):
1976 - 2004
Owner, Great Alaskan Food Co.: 1983 - 2004
Chair, Community Activity Center Task Force:
1985 - 1989
Alaska Council on Economic Education: 1984 - 1996
MAPCO Alaska - Citizens Advisory Board: 1986 - 1996
Service Organizations and Community Involvement:
Fairbanks Youth Sports Board: 1981 - present
President, Fairbanks Youth Sports Foundation: 1988 - present
Rotary of Fairbanks: 1977 - present; President: 1987
Fairbanks Chamber of Commerce, 1983 - present
- Chair: 1991 - 1992
Co-Chair, Military Affairs Committee: 1989 - 1995
Alaska Crippled Children Board: 1989 - 1995
Chair, Methodist Church Pastor Parish Relations Committee: 1994 - 1995
President, Lathrop High School Basketball Boosters: 1987-89, 1993-96
- Soviet Union Visit Team Leader: 1989
Awards & Recognitions:
Fairbanks Daily News Miner Community Service
Award: 1990
University of Alaska Fairbanks Business Leader
of the Year: 1995
Rotarian of the Year: 1990
Oregon State University Sports Hall of Fame
(Team): 1993
Jim Messer Support of the Military Award
Special Interests:
Family, hunting, fishing, boating.
Legislative Service:
- 25th (2007-2008)
- 24th (2005-2006)
- 23rd (2003-2004)
- 22nd (2001-2002)
- 21st (1999-2000)
- 20th (1997-1998)
Legislative Service:
- 25th (2007-2008)
- 24th (2005-2006)
- 23rd (2003-2004)
- 22nd (2001-2002)
- 21st (1999-2000)
- 20th (1997-1998)
Bill | Short Title | Prime Sponsor(s) | Current Status | Status Date | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
FOUNDATION FORMULA INCREASE | SENATOR WILKEN |
(S) FIN | 05/10/2002 | ||
MUNICIPALITIES:INCORP/PROPERTY VALUATION | SENATOR WILKEN |
(H) CRA | 04/12/2001 | ||
WILLIAM R. WOOD FAIRBANKS INTL AIRPORT | SENATOR WILKEN |
(H) RLS | 03/19/2001 | ||
RIGHT OF ACTION FOR LEGAL SEPARATION | SENATOR WILKEN |
(S) JUD | 03/21/2001 | ||
GUARDIANSHIPS; CONSERVATORSHIPS | SENATOR WILKEN |
(S) STA | 04/11/2001 | ||
PFD ELIGIBILITY FOR PEACE CORP VOLUNTEERS | SENATOR WILKEN |
(S) HES | 01/14/2002 | ||
SPORT FISH LICENSES FOR 9/11 RESPONDERS | SENATOR WILKEN |
CHAPTER 132 SLA 02 | 07/05/2002 | ||
REGULATION OF NURSING | SENATOR WILKEN |
(S) L&C | 03/01/2002 | ||
MENTAL HEALTH TRUST LAND UNIT EMPLOYEES | SENATOR WILKEN |
CHAPTER 27 SLA 02 | 05/18/2002 | ||
DEFINITION OF MENTAL HEALTH PROFESSIONAL | SENATOR WILKEN |
CHAPTER 73 SLA 02 | 06/20/2002 | ||
REVISION OF VETERINARY STATUTES | SENATOR WILKEN |
(S) L&C | 02/19/2002 | ||
MANDATORY INCORPORATION OF BOROUGHS | SENATOR WILKEN |
(S) CRA | 02/19/2002 | ||
NCAA BASKETBALL PRESEASON TOURNAMENTS | SENATOR WILKEN |
(S) STA | 01/17/2001 | ||
INFO ABOUT LONG-TERM CARE INSURANCE | SENATOR WILKEN |
LEGIS RESOLVE 36 | 07/07/2001 |
Cosponsored Bills
Bill | Short Title | Prime Sponsor(s) | Current Status | Status Date | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
BOROUGH REVENUES FOR TOURISM MARKETING | REPRESENTATIVE WHITAKER |
CHAPTER 14 SLA 01 | 04/23/2001 | ||
EAGLE RIVER VETERANS' MEMORIAL HIGHWAY | REPRESENTATIVE KOTT |
CHAPTER 6 SLA 01 | 03/29/2001 | ||
SOCIAL SECURITY # & DRIVER'S LICENSES | REPRESENTATIVE COGHILL |
CHAPTER 40 SLA 01 | 06/25/2001 | ||
CIVIL LIABILITY AND LIVESTOCK | REPRESENTATIVE COGHILL |
(S) JUD | 04/24/2001 | ||
MOTOR VEH.LIC.PLATES: NATL GUARD/ANTIQUE | REPRESENTATIVE DYSON |
CHAPTER 44 SLA 01 | 06/25/2001 | ||
RIGHT OF ACTION FOR LEGAL SEPARATION | REPRESENTATIVE DYSON |
CHAPTER 80 SLA 02 | 06/20/2002 | ||
RIGHT-OF-WAY TO DENALI BOR. FOR RR/UTIL. | REPRESENTATIVE JAMES |
CHAPTER 2 SLA 02 | 01/16/2002 | ||
REGULATION OF NURSING | REPRESENTATIVE WILSON |
CHAPTER 97 SLA 02 | 06/28/2002 | ||
PROCUREMENT OF TRAVEL SERVICES | REPRESENTATIVE HAYES |
CHAPTER 112 SLA 02 | 07/01/2002 | ||
NONCOMPLIANCE WITH SELECTIVE SERVICE | REPRESENTATIVES MURKOWSKI, HARRIS, MULDER, JAMES |
CHAPTER 89 SLA 02 | 06/27/2002 | ||
OIL/GAS EXPLORATION INCENTIVE CREDIT | REPRESENTATIVE FATE |
CHAPTER 139 SLA 02 | 07/05/2002 | ||
PHYSICIAN ASSISTANTS | REPRESENTATIVE FATE |
CHAPTER 18 SLA 02 | 05/08/2002 | ||
DISABLED VETERANS LICENSE PLATES | REPRESENTATIVE MCGUIRE |
CHAPTER 31 SLA 02 | 05/29/2002 | ||
AFRICAN-AMERICAN CITIZEN RECOGNIT'N MONTH | REPRESENTATIVE DYSON |
LEGIS RESOLVE 40 | 04/17/2002 | ||
INHALANTS AND POISONS AWARENESS WEEKS | REPRESENTATIVE KAPSNER |
LEGIS RESOLVE 11 | 03/27/2001 | ||
SEPT 11 DAY OF REMEMBRANCE | REPRESENTATIVE STEVENS |
LEGIS RESOLVE 49 | 04/17/2002 | ||
DESECRATION OF U.S. FLAG | REPRESENTATIVE KOTT |
LEGIS RESOLVE 59 | 06/19/2002 | ||
SUPPORT WAR ON TERRORISM & SUPPORT PEACE | REPRESENTATIVE JAMES |
LEGIS RESOLVE 48 | 04/12/2002 | ||
REPEAL ESTATE TAX | REPRESENTATIVE JAMES |
(S) RLS | 05/13/2002 | ||
ALASKA AIRLINES 70TH ANNIVERSARY | REPRESENTATIVE KOTT |
LEGIS RESOLVE 46 | 04/12/2002 | ||
FIREFIGHTER/EMT MUNI. PROP. TAX EXEMPTION | SENATOR THERRIAULT |
CHAPTER 54 SLA 02 | 06/19/2002 | ||
ADD PHYSICIAN ASST TO STATE MEDICAL BOARD | SENATOR OLSON |
CHAPTER 16 SLA 01 | 04/27/2001 | ||
TAKE A CHILD HUNTING SEASON | SENATOR KELLY |
CHAPTER 68 SLA 01 | 07/03/2001 | ||
RIGHT-OF-WAY LEASING ACT | SENATOR THERRIAULT |
CHAPTER 18 SLA 01 | 04/27/2001 | ||
FRED ZHAROFF MEMORIAL BRIDGE | SENATOR AUSTERMAN |
CHAPTER 11 SLA 01 | 04/10/2001 | ||
APPROP: SPECIAL OLYMPICS | SENATOR HALFORD |
(S) RLS | 02/15/2001 | ||
TEACHER EMPLOYMENT & SUBJECT EXPERTISE | SENATOR KELLY |
CHAPTER 69 SLA 01 | 07/03/2001 | ||
SOCIAL SECURITY # & DRIVER'S LICENSES | SENATOR THERRIAULT |
(S) RLS | 03/13/2001 | ||
ALASKA HUMAN RESOURCE INVESTMENT COUNCIL | SENATOR TORGERSON |
CHAPTER 102 SLA 01 | 07/13/2001 | ||
REGIONAL & VILLAGE PUB.SAFETY OFFICERS | SENATOR HALFORD |
CHAPTER 97 SLA 01 | 07/10/2001 | ||
NO GAS PIPELINE OVER BEAUFORT SEA | SENATOR TORGERSON |
CHAPTER 29 SLA 01 | 05/16/2001 | ||
NAVIGABLE WATERS COMMISSION | SENATOR HALFORD |
CHAPTER 71 SLA 02 | 06/20/2002 | ||
AUTHORIZING ELECTRONIC BALLOTS | SENATOR LEMAN |
(S) RLS | 02/11/2002 | ||
PHYSICIAN ASSISTANTS/NURSE PRACTITIONERS | SENATOR OLSON |
(S) RLS | 03/15/2002 | ||
TAKING PROPERTY BY EMINENT DOMAIN | SENATOR TORGERSON |
(H) RLS | 05/09/2002 | ||
ADULT DAY SERVICES FACILITIES | SENATOR ELLIS |
(S) HES | 02/13/2002 | ||
STATE TRUST FUND MONIES | SENATOR THERRIAULT |
(S) FIN | 04/16/2002 | ||
SOBRIETY AWARENESS MONTH | SENATOR WARD |
LEGIS RESOLVE 10 | 03/27/2001 | ||
F-22 RAPTOR AIRCRAFT AT ELMENDORF AFB | SENATOR LEMAN |
LEGIS RESOLVE 6 | 03/09/2001 | ||
NCAA BASKETBALL PRESEASON TOURNAMENTS | SENATOR LEMAN |
LEGIS RESOLVE 2 | 01/29/2001 | ||
VOTING SITES AT MILITARY INSTALLATIONS | SENATOR LEMAN |
LEGIS RESOLVE 8 | 03/27/2001 | ||
NATIONAL MISSILE DEFENSE SYSTEM | SENATOR LEMAN |
LEGIS RESOLVE 7 | 03/27/2001 | ||
US COAST GUARD FUNDING | SENATOR AUSTERMAN |
LEGIS RESOLVE 19 | 04/23/2001 | ||
ELIMINATE MARRIAGE TAX PENALTY | SENATOR LEMAN |
LEGIS RESOLVE 13 | 03/27/2001 | ||
TAX EXEMPT BONDS TO FUND VETERANS LOANS | SENATOR WARD |
LEGIS RESOLVE 52 | 05/03/2002 | ||
PLEDGE OF ALLEGIANCE RESOLUTION | SENATOR GREEN |
SENATE RESOLVE 2 | 07/17/2002 |
Legislative Service:
- 25th (2007-2008)
- 24th (2005-2006)
- 23rd (2003-2004)
- 22nd (2001-2002)
- 21st (1999-2000)
- 20th (1997-1998)